This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 13:58:14 (UTC).

LAFOY, JIMMY A, SHERLING, DOROTHY DAVIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 LAFOY, JIMMY A, SHERLING, DOROTHY DAVIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LAFOY, JIMMY A

SHERLING, WILLIAM G III

Interested Party

SHERLING, DOROTHY DAVIS

Decedent

SHERLING, DOROTHY NORMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Decedent Attorney

MCGILL, ROBERT EDGAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED/AUTHENTICATED COPIES FROM THE STATE OF ALAMABA LEE COUNTY:PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, WAIVER OF NTICE, ALABAMA DEATH CERTIFICATE, LASTE WILL AND TESTEMENT, CODICIAL TO THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT, ORDER SETTING, ORDER ADMITTING WILL, APPOINTEMNT OF CO-PERSONAL RESPRESENTATVIES, LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, NOTICE TO CREDITORS, PETITION FOR FINAL SETTLEMENT, RECEIPT FOR DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, DECREE OF FINAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCOVER LETTER FROM ROBERT E MCGILL III PA DATED 04/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF ANCILLARY SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $345.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 129416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM STATE OF AL COUNTY OF LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANCILLARY SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGILL, ROBERT EDGAR