This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:19:41 (UTC).

LAFLIN, JEAN MASON VS GAFFORD, BILLY JOE

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 LAFLIN, JEAN MASON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GAFFORD, BILLY JOE. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAFLIN, JEAN MASON

Respondent

GAFFORD, BILLY JOE

Not Classified By Court

L, A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO BILLY JOE GAFFORD ON 08/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF ORDER SETTING HEARING ON INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO BILLY JOE GAFFORD 8-11-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK TO SANTA ROSA SHERIFF FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING ORDER SETTING HEARING ON INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRESTRAINING ORDER QUESTIONNAIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less