This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:34:14 (UTC).

KLP DESTIN, LLC VS DRHI, INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2009 KLP DESTIN, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DRHI, INC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LAPORTE, W HOWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LAPORTE, W HOWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KLP DESTIN, LLC

Defendants

OLSON & ASSOCIATES OF NW FLORI

NATURE WALK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIA

FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES COR

DRHI, INC

PHILLIPS, SANDRA

OLSON, CARL R JR

MCMAHON, PETER GUY

PHILLIPS, RUPERT

OLSON, ELAINE

NATUREWALK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

RICK, OLSON

OLSON, RICHARD

BANKATLANTIC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GREEN, WILLIAM HOWARD

RICH, BRIAN G

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT; MAC

10/16/2009:COMPLAINT; MAC

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MDB

05/11/2010:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MDB

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS' RUPERT

12/01/2009:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS' RUPERT

ANSWER OF CARL R OLSON JR AND ELAINE OLSON TO COMPLAINT FOR

11/23/2009:ANSWER OF CARL R OLSON JR AND ELAINE OLSON TO COMPLAINT FOR

SUMMONS ISSUED TO OLSON & ASSOCIATED OF NW FLORIDA; MAC

10/16/2009:SUMMONS ISSUED TO OLSON & ASSOCIATED OF NW FLORIDA; MAC

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED; MAC

10/16/2009:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED; MAC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; SH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; SH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • DocketP.A. DATED 62810; SH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO MARTI FROM FLEET, SPENCER & KILPATRICK,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK 70.70:KD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK; AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG: AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION;SH

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketCOUNTY, INC C/O MICHAEL G. STANDLEY; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DRHI, INC; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO OLSON & ASSOCIATED OF NW FLORIDA; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NATUREWALK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NATURE WALK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLSON & ASSOCIATES OF NW FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where BankAtlantic is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Rich