Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 17:03:40 (UTC).

KILGORE, GABRIELLE ALEXIS VS WOODS, DEAUNTAE KEAVEN

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 KILGORE, GABRIELLE ALEXIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WOODS, DEAUNTAE KEAVEN. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KILGORE, GABRIELLE ALEXIS

Respondent

WOODS, DEAUNTAE KEAVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO DEAUNTAE KEAVEN WOODS ON 03/12/2021 BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO ORANGE COUNTY CIVIL PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: DEAUNTAE WOODS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED - PETITONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketLETTER WITH CIVIL PROCESS INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF:GABRIELLE KILGORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSHARED PARENTING PLAN;SIGNED BY GABRIELLE KILGORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY GABRIELLE KILGORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPARTIES' INFORMATION SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 140020

    Read MoreRead Less