Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 17:01:01 (UTC).

KEOWN, BRITTANY VS KEOWN, SHAWN MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 KEOWN, BRITTANY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEOWN, SHAWN MATTHEW. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEOWN, BRITTANY

Respondent

KEOWN, SHAWN MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

WHEELER, ANDREW DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVER LICENSE: BRITTANY KEOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • ORDER TO ATTEND DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • SHARED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF BRITTANY KEOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • FAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118787

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEELER, ANDREW DONALD