This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/13/2022 at 04:49:02 (UTC).

KEMP, DANNY RAY, KEMP, TYLER Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 KEMP, DANNY RAY, KEMP, TYLER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEMP, TYLER

Decedent

KEMP, DANNY RAY

Interested Parties

SHAW, TRACI

JUDGMENT ENFORCEMENT SOLUTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LADWIG, CHRISTINE SUTHERLIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL BY KEVIN R JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION DFS HERALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 146840

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Judgment Enforcement Solution Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LADWIG, CHRISTINE SUTHERLIN