This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 02/11/2021 at 00:28:13 (UTC).

JTS CAPITAL 1 LLC Et Al VS BEAR CREEK DEVELOPMENT, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2014 JTS CAPITAL 1 LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BEAR CREEK DEVELOPMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JTS CAPITAL 1 LLC

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

PERRY, MIKE L

THREE OAKS, LLC

BEAR CREEK DEVELOPMENT, LLC

SMITH, WILLIAM H

ROOKIS, RICHARD J

BEAR CREEK ESTATES HOMEOWNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIORDANO, PAUL ANTHONY

Defendant Attorneys

TAYLOR, SAMUEL BRADLEY

KAUFFMAN, ROBERT LEE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

08/19/2016:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

COVER LETTER TO CLARK PARTINGTON HART DATED 06/20/16

06/20/2016:COVER LETTER TO CLARK PARTINGTON HART DATED 06/20/16

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

04/13/2016:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

04/13/2016:ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

04/11/2016:PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN

04/11/2016:LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN

SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

03/16/2016:SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

03/16/2016:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

03/03/2016:PROPOSED SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

03/03/2016:PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM CLARK PARTINGTON DATED 03/03/16

03/03/2016:LETTER TO JUDGE GREEN FROM CLARK PARTINGTON DATED 03/03/16

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/12/2016:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE 3/18/16

12/18/2015:AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE 3/18/16

COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

12/18/2015:COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF CLARK PARTINGTON DATED 12/16/15

12/18/2015:COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF CLARK PARTINGTON DATED 12/16/15

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

12/16/2015:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

PROPOSED AMENDED NOTICE OF SALE

12/16/2015:PROPOSED AMENDED NOTICE OF SALE

AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

12/14/2015:AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2016
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO CLARK PARTINGTON HART DATED 06/20/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER GRANTING CONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE SALE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketCONSENT MOTION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/11/2016; Reopen Close Date: 04/13/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE BY CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO BEAR CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD J ROOKIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO MIKE L PERRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO THREE OAKS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO BEAR CREEK DEVELOPMENT LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM H. SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND ATTACHMENTS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR CREEK ESTATES HOA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFFMAN, ROBERT LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Samuel Bradley