This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 11:19:38 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA VS HUFTY, JAISON

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA filed an Other lawsuit against HUFTY, JAISON. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

Defendant

HUFTY, JAISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA BIANCA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

08/30/2021:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAISON HUFTY

08/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAISON HUFTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON JAISON HUFTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNON-MILITARY SERVICE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO JASON HUFTY ON 9/27/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAISON HUFTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR JAISON HUFTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 147846

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B