This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 03/24/2019 at 23:35:08 (UTC).

JONES, MICHAEL T VS ALLEN, KEANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 JONES, MICHAEL T filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLEN, KEANT. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, MICHAEL T

Defendants

LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS LLC

LARRY BATCHELOR MECHANICAL LLC

ALLEN, KEANT

Not Classified By Court

ALLEN, KENET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRICE, WILLIAM BANTON

Defendant Attorneys

PALMER, ELIZABETH NICOLE

HALL, MEGAN MARIE

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

09/06/2017:DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

08/15/2017:DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

08/11/2017:NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

08/09/2017:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

08/09/2017:NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

06/30/2017:DEFENDANT'S' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PALINTIFF

06/30/2017:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PALINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

06/30/2017:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS', LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC, LARRY BATCHELOR MECHANICAL, LLC, AND KEANT ALLEN, ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/30/2017:DEFENDANTS', LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC, LARRY BATCHELOR MECHANICAL, LLC, AND KEANT ALLEN, ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/08/2017:FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE TO KEANT ALLEN ON 4/24/17

04/24/2017:PROOF OF SERVICE TO KEANT ALLEN ON 4/24/17

PROOF OF NONSERVICE ON KEANT ALLEN ON 4/5/17

04/13/2017:PROOF OF NONSERVICE ON KEANT ALLEN ON 4/5/17

PROOF OF SERVICE TO LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC ON 4/5/17

04/13/2017:PROOF OF SERVICE TO LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC ON 4/5/17

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KEANT ALLEN

03/24/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KEANT ALLEN

UNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR KEANT ALLEN C/O LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

03/23/2017:UNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR KEANT ALLEN C/O LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

UNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

03/23/2017:UNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

COMPLAINT

03/23/2017:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET;

03/23/2017:CIVIL COVER SHEET;

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, KEANT ALLEN'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DEFENDANT KEANT ALLEN'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SHAM PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE ON FRANK GENTILE ON 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DEFENDANT, KEANT ALLEN'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF WITNESS FRANK GENTILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DEFENDANT KEANT ALLEN'S AMENDED CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DONALD CHIPMAN M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5-9-19 AT 11:30 PM CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DEFENDANT, LARRY BATCHELOR MECHANICAL, LLC'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SHAM PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DEFENDANT, KEANT ALLEN'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, MICHAEL T. JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KEANT ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $20.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 86124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR KEANT ALLEN C/O LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR LARRY BATCHELOR HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 86116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRICE, WILLIAM BANTON