Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/03/2019 at 18:00:38 (UTC).

JOHNSON, BEVERLY, JOHNSON, BEVERLY THORNE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 JOHNSON, BEVERLY, JOHNSON, BEVERLY THORNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, BEVERLY

Not Classified By Court

MATHEWS, ANTHONY T

MATHEWS, VIRGINIA

THORNE, LEAMON OLIN JR

JOHNSON, BEVERLY THORNE

WHITE, VIRGINIA RENEE

Decedent

MATHEWS, VIRGINIA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

WIDMAN, SHANNON LIANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • UNSIGNED LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118847

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less