This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 06/17/2022 at 08:20:09 (UTC).

JCL, MINOR CHILD Et Al VS EMERALD COAST MOOD AND MEMORY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2011 JCL, MINOR CHILD filed an Other lawsuit against EMERALD COAST MOOD AND MEMORY. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOWREY, AUSTIN SHERIDAN II

JCL, MINOR CHILD

Defendants

UNKNOWN WEBSITE OWNER

PEREZ, VERONICA LEE

EMERALD COAST MOOD AND MEMORY

GREENE, ELFRIEDE L

SCHAUMANN, BRITTANY

GREENE, RANDY D

SCHAUMANN, KATHY R

IGLEBURGER, JAMES LOUIS MD

SCHAUMANN, RICHARD PETER SR

Not Classified By Court

WWWWALTONMUGSHOTSC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CAMPBELL, JAMES CLARENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING RENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketFAXED COPY OF DEFENDANT, VERONICA LEE PEREZ' ANSWER; TP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketJAMES C. CAMPBELL, P.A.; TP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketFAXED COVER SHEET DATED 04/11/12 FROM THE OFFICE OF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DocketDEFENDANT, VERONICA LEE PEREZ' ANSWER; TP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT;TB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO DIMISS;TM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketOWNER; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN WWW.WALTONMUGSHOTS.COM WEBSITE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO VERONICA LEE PEREZ; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BRITTANY SCHAUMANN; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KATHY R SCHAUMANN; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD PETER SCHAUMANN SR; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ELFRIEDE L GREENE; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO REV. RANDY D GREENE; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DEFAMATION, LIBEL, SLANDER AND DEMAND FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPBELL , JAMES CLARENCE