This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 22:54:42 (UTC).

INSPIRATION AT SANDESTIN CONDO VS DECKERT, TIMOTHY Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2014 INSPIRATION AT SANDESTIN CONDO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DECKERT, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and SANTURRI, THOMAS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

SANTURRI, THOMAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSPIRATION AT SANDESTIN CONDO

Defendants

DECKERT, TIMOTHY

PALMER, CRAIG B

VANCE, VERCELL

FLAGG, FREDERICK T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, AARON A

Defendant Attorneys

ZOESCH, JOHN R

SMITH, PARKER BENTLEY

 

Court Documents

CONSENT NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

03/31/2016:CONSENT NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

03/24/2016:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

02/23/2016:ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

02/22/2016:PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

ORDER SETTING JUDGE TRIAL FOR APRIL 5, 2016 @ 1:30 PM (CST)

01/08/2016:ORDER SETTING JUDGE TRIAL FOR APRIL 5, 2016 @ 1:30 PM (CST)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; OF CRAIG B PALMER AND TIMOTHY DICKERT

12/31/2015:CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; OF CRAIG B PALMER AND TIMOTHY DICKERT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT JANUARY 7, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/30/2015:ORDER GRANTING MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT JANUARY 7, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF INSPIRATION AT SANDESTIN CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

12/28/2015:CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF INSPIRATION AT SANDESTIN CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT JANUARY 7, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/28/2015:PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT JANUARY 7, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE -JANUARY 7, 2016 AT 2:30 PM (CST)

12/21/2015:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE -JANUARY 7, 2016 AT 2:30 PM (CST)

PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/17/2015:PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE

SECOND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/15/2015:SECOND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

LETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM JAMES C. BARTH

10/29/2015:LETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM JAMES C. BARTH

ORDER CONTINUING CASE

07/30/2015:ORDER CONTINUING CASE

PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE

07/29/2015:PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE

LETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM PARKER B. SMITH, P.A. DATED 7/29/15

07/29/2015:LETTER TO JUDGE SANTURRI FROM PARKER B. SMITH, P.A. DATED 7/29/15

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS CRAIG PALMER

07/27/2015:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS CRAIG PALMER

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TIMOTHY DECKERT

07/27/2015:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TIMOTHY DECKERT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS VERCELL VANCE, CRAIG B PALMER AND TIMOTHY DECKERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketJOINT MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING JUDGE TRIAL FOR APRIL 5, 2016 @ 1:30 PM (CST)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT; OF CRAIG B PALMER AND TIMOTHY DICKERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC ATTENDANCE AT JANUARY 7, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF INSPIRATION AT SANDESTIN CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:TIMOTHY DECKERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:CRAIG B. PALMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:FREDERICK T. FLAGG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO:VERCELL VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY DECKERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRAIG B. PALMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO FREDERICK T. FLAGG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO VERCELL VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, AARON A