Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 07/20/2019 at 17:01:24 (UTC).

HUSTED, JAMES PHILLIPS VS HUSTED, SANDRA KAY PETTIT

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 HUSTED, JAMES PHILLIPS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUSTED, SANDRA KAY PETTIT. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HUSTED, JAMES PHILLIPS

Respondent

HUSTED, SANDRA KAY PETTIT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CORLEW, BRIAN WESLEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT DOM CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • LETTER TO JUDGE LEWIS FROM KITTY SIMS DATED 7/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF: JAMES HUSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • ANSWER AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • FAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT - MORE THAN $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PETITIONER'S AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PARTIES' INFORMATION SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118423

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORLEW, BRIAN WESLEY