This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 16:01:25 (UTC).

HOFHEINZ, STEVE VS MYERS, BOBBY DEAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 HOFHEINZ, STEVE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MYERS, BOBBY DEAN. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOFHEINZ, STEVE

Defendant

MYERS, BOBBY DEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 05/11/2021 09:00; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MAIN 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO BOBBY MYERS ON 038/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR HEARINGS SET MAY 11, 2021 @ 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $90.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 139988

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less