Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/23/2021 at 17:04:17 (UTC).

HENSSGE, CHRISTINA CAROLINE VS HENSSGE, ULRICH

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 HENSSGE, CHRISTINA CAROLINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HENSSGE, ULRICH. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HENSSGE, CHRISTINA CAROLINE

Respondent

HENSSGE, ULRICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZASADA, RICHARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO ULRICH HENSSGE ON 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DEPARTMENT OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: ULRICH HENSSGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO ULRICH HENSSGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF: CHRISTINA HENSSGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketVERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY MEDIATION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $418.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 140048

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZASADA, RICHARD