Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 18:01:27 (UTC).

HEAD, BENJAMIN KENNETH, HEAD, MICHAEL SCOTT Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 HEAD, BENJAMIN KENNETH, HEAD, MICHAEL SCOTT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HEAD, MICHAEL SCOTT

Decedent

HEAD, BENJAMIN KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

CORDLE, NATHAN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $23.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $23.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL OF NONRESIDENT TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING ANCILLARY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • ANCILLARY LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • EXEMPLIFIED/AUTHENTICATED COPIES FROM HALL COUNTY GEORGIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • COVER LETTER FROM CLARK PARTINGTON DATED JULY 2, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118586

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • UNSIGNED ANCILLARY LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL OF NONRESIDENT TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING ANCILLARY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less