This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 09/23/2021 at 04:25:26 (UTC).

GOLDEN, ALEX VS GOLDEN, KATIE

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 GOLDEN, ALEX filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GOLDEN, KATIE. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOLDEN, ALEX

Respondent

GOLDEN, KATIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HILLEY, TIMOTHY WAYNE

Respondent Attorney

VANDYKE, ZACHARY ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2021
  • DocketFAMILY MEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION - AUGUST 2, 2021 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketORDER ON PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ON PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 5/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING ON MAY 13, 2021 AT 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - JUNE 30, 2021 AT 3:30 PM CST (HUSBAND'S MOTION TO ESTABLISH TEMPORARY PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY AND TIME-SHARING AND TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE OF THE RESIDENCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY TIMOTHY W HILLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketHUSBAND'S VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $418.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 138893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less