This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/07/2019 at 14:32:11 (UTC).

GIERHART, GREGORY VS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 GIERHART, GREGORY filed an Other lawsuit against CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIERHART, GREGORY

Defendant

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANTANA, SENTHIA TOWERY

Defendant Attorney

KAPSALES, AYDA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/15/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/14/2019:COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES ON DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES ON DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES ON DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES OF DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES ON DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT, CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 122861

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AYDA KAPSALES