Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 17:01:15 (UTC).

GIBSON, BRETT MEYER VS GIBSON, ANGIE

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 GIBSON, BRETT MEYER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GIBSON, ANGIE. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GIBSON, BRETT MEYER

Respondent

GIBSON, ANGIE

Not Classified By Court

GIBSON, ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

WHEELER, ANDREW DONALD

WATERHOUSE, CASEY PLESS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $4.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 119612

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS (CLAY B. ADKINSON, AS ATTORNEY FOR BRETT GIBSON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: ANGIE GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO ANGIE GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVING PETITONER'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF PETITIONER'S DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION BY ANDREW D WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • FAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY AND DEPENDENT MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEELER, ANDREW DONALD