Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 07/25/2019 at 17:01:48 (UTC).

GARRETT, DONNA VS GARRETT, CASPER

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 GARRETT, DONNA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARRETT, CASPER. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARRETT, DONNA

Respondent

GARRETT, CASPER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/19/19 @ 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • FAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118559

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS - NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER PETITIONER DONNA GARRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF RESPONDENT CASPER GARRETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less