This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 06/25/2022 at 14:45:59 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS BAILEY BROWN, JHERI ALEXANDRIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BAILEY BROWN, JHERI ALEXANDRIA. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD and LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

BAILEY BROWN, JHERI ALEXANDRIA

JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY BROWN,

HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT MASTER AS

HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT HOMEOWNER

OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY, UNKNO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAEED, AAMIR HAYAT

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

05/27/2022:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/27/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY-BROWN A/K/A JHERI BROWN F/K/A JHERI BAILEY

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY-BROWN A/K/A JHERI BROWN F/K/A JHERI BAILEY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY-BROWN

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY-BROWN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT MASTER ASSOCIATION

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT MASTER ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

06/03/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY-BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JHERI ALEXANDRIA BAILEY-BROWN A/K/A JHERI BROWN F/K/A JHERI BAILEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - UNKNOWN SPOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - HAMMOCK BAY FREEPORT HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - JHERI BAILEY-BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,966.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 159013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,966.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY, UNKNO is a litigant

Latest cases where Freedom Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saeed Aamir, Esq