This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 19:11:36 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO VS BALDWIN, ROBERT B III Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BALDWIN, ROBERT B III. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and SANTURRI, THOMAS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

SANTURRI, THOMAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO

Defendants

BALDWIN, ROBERT B III

BUMPUS, WILLIAM SCOTT

BANCORPSOUTH BANK

EASTERN LAKE VILLAGE CONDOMINI

VISION BANK

TENANT, UNKNOWN

WILLIAMS, WORTH R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILDMAN, ROSEMARIE ANGELLA

Defendant Attorneys

CRITZER, SAMUEL SCOTT

WHITE, AARON A

MEAD, MICHAEL WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT RE-FORECLOSURE

06/22/2017:SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT RE-FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/06/2017:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING 8-1-17 AT 3:00 PM

05/22/2017:NOTICE OF HEARING 8-1-17 AT 3:00 PM

NOTICE OF HEARING 6-20-17 AT 4:00 PM EST/ 3:00 PM CST

05/22/2017:NOTICE OF HEARING 6-20-17 AT 4:00 PM EST/ 3:00 PM CST

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT REFORECLOSURE

04/24/2017:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT REFORECLOSURE

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

04/24/2017:AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - ENTERED

04/21/2017:DEFAULT - ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT /PROPOSED DEFAULT

04/21/2017:MOTION FOR DEFAULT /PROPOSED DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE TO VISION BANK ON 3/30/17

03/31/2017:PROOF OF SERVICE TO VISION BANK ON 3/30/17

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO VISION BANK

03/21/2017:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO VISION BANK

UNSIGNED ALIAS SUMMONS VISION BANK

03/21/2017:UNSIGNED ALIAS SUMMONS VISION BANK

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR STRICT REFORECLOSURE ENTERED ON AUAGUST 2, 2016

01/18/2017:ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR STRICT REFORECLOSURE ENTERED ON AUAGUST 2, 2016

NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA.R.JUD.ADMIN 2.516

11/16/2016:NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA.R.JUD.ADMIN 2.516

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR STRICT REFORECLOSURE ENTERED ON AUGUST 2, 2016

08/30/2016:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR STRICT REFORECLOSURE ENTERED ON AUGUST 2, 2016

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF STRICT RE-FORECLOSURE

08/02/2016:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF STRICT RE-FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/2/16 AT 2 PM CST

06/22/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING ON 8/2/16 AT 2 PM CST

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT REFORECLOSURE

06/06/2016:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT REFORECLOSURE

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

06/06/2016:AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketREOPENED FOR CIVIL OTHER ON 4/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketREOPEN CIVIL OTHER CLOSED ON 1/18/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketREOPEN CIVIL OTHER CLOSED ON 6/22/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT RE-FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 8-1-17 AT 3:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 6-20-17 AT 4:00 PM EST/ 3:00 PM CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF STRICT REFORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND ATTACHMENTS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/24/2017; Reopen Close Date: 06/22/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 08/30/2016; Reopen Close Date: 01/18/2017; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketReopen Date: 08/07/2015; Reopen Close Date: 08/02/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketReopen Date: 05/06/2015; Reopen Close Date: 06/18/2015; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketReopen Date: 04/07/2015; Reopen Close Date: 04/13/2015; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vision Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where BancorpSouth Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEMARIE WILDMAN