Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 07/26/2019 at 16:02:16 (UTC).

FANCHER, MATTHEW WAYNE VS SMITH, AMY C Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 FANCHER, MATTHEW WAYNE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, AMY C. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FANCHER, MATTHEW WAYNE

Defendants

THOMAS, MICHAEL

SMITH, AMY C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING: 9/17/2019 9:30-10:15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO AMY C. SMITH 7-12-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • PRE-TRIAL/FINAL HEARING MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO MICHAEL THOMAS 7-8-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO: MICHAEL THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ISSUED TO: AMY C SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $320.00 RECEIPT NUMBER AX 26477

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Event Date: 07/17/2019 15:30; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: CX JUDGE CHAMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less