This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/11/2020 at 15:18:05 (UTC).

EMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRAC VS MCCLENDON, BRANCH Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 EMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRAC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MCCLENDON, BRANCH. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRAC

Defendants

RBM CONTRACTING SERVICES LLC

MCCLENDON, BRANCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEASLEY, ROBERT OTHELL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketEMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRACTORS, LLC'S ANSWER TO RBM CONTRACTING SERVICES, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, EMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRACTORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, EMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRACTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, EMERALD COAST BUILDING CONTRACTORS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: RBM CONTRACTING SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: BRANCH MCCLENDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $20.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 127010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 126824

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEASLEY, ROBERT O