This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 08/30/2022 at 16:02:30 (UTC).

EAST 30 A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATE VS FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORI Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 EAST 30 A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORI. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST 30 A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATE

Defendants

FIRSTSERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORI

THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIAT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON, ALFRED BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorneys

CARTER, JEFFREY S.

MILAM, DAVID HARPER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

02/02/2018:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II ON 10:15 AM

06/07/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II ON 10:15 AM

ORDER ON THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/16/2022:ORDER ON THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II

04/08/2022:DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II

PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

03/30/2021:PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW

01/19/2021:ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW

ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR JANUARY 14, 2021 CASE MAGEMENT HEARING

12/23/2020:ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANT THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR JANUARY 14, 2021 CASE MAGEMENT HEARING

MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/16/2020:MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT, FIRST SERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.'S, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/17/2020:DEFENDANT, FIRST SERVICE RESIDENTIAL FLORIDA, INC.'S, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

09/04/2020:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

DEPOSITION OF KIM SALLINGER AS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF EAST 30A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC

08/18/2020:DEPOSITION OF KIM SALLINGER AS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF EAST 30A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC

DEPOSITION OF JEFFREY BLATT AS CORPORAET REPRESENTATIVE OF EAST 30A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC

08/18/2020:DEPOSITION OF JEFFREY BLATT AS CORPORAET REPRESENTATIVE OF EAST 30A RESTAURANT ASSOCIATES LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF PAUL JOHNSTON

08/18/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF PAUL JOHNSTON

AFFIDAVIT OF JUSTIN HAWLEY

08/18/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF JUSTIN HAWLEY

MOTION JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

08/18/2020:MOTION JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY UNDER COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

08/18/2020:MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY UNDER COUNTS I AND II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

05/29/2019:MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

ORDER

12/18/2018:ORDER

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC. MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCASE LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT, THE VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION, INC.'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITON TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II ON 10:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET JUNE 2, 2022 @ 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF DEPOSITION OF JUSTIN HAWLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF DEPOSITION OF ROGER ROPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II ON 06-02-2022 AT 2:00 PM CST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DUNLAP AND SHIPMAN 2-7-18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 2-7-18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: DUNLAP & SHIPMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO: DUNLAP & SHIPMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 99244

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, ALFRED BENJAMIN