This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:17:57 (UTC).

EALUM, JESSICA B VS EALUM, JOSHUA L

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 EALUM, JESSICA B filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EALUM, JOSHUA L. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EALUM, JESSICA B

Respondent

EALUM, JOSHUA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOLMAN, TONYA

Respondent Attorney

WILLIAMS, JAY DAYTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 07-27-2022 AT 1:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE DATED MAY 6, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR UPDATED PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO WIFE'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketFAMILY MEDIATION INCOME VERIFICATION AFFIDAVIT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketFAMILY MEDIATION COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: JESSICA EALUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT (UCCJEA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPARTIES' INFORMATION SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JAY D