This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/11/2020 at 20:01:46 (UTC).

DUBINET, IULIA VS GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUAL

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 DUBINET, IULIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUAL. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUBINET, IULIA

Defendant

GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF, GRANT WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/24/2020:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE DEFENDANT, GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; DEFENDANT, GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND INSURANCE COMPANY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketANSWER DEFENDANT GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PALINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY (GRANTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (SECOND) 8-21-20 AT 11:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 129574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO GULFSTREAM PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURNACE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketLETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY GRANT W KRAPF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFSTREAM PROPERTY AND CASUAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT W KRAPF, ESQ