Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/03/2019 at 13:31:16 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ANDERSEN, SHERRIE R

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against ANDERSEN, SHERRIE R. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ANDERSEN, SHERRIE R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

Defendant Attorney

FLORES, SARAH ELAINA

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE TO SHERRIE R. ANDERSEN ON 7/22/19

07/24/2019:PROOF OF SERVICE TO SHERRIE R. ANDERSEN ON 7/22/19

COMPLAINT

07/10/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY 7-29-19 TO 8-16-19 & 8-20-19 TO 11-25-19 BY SARAH E FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DEFENDNAT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BY SARAH E FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO SHERRIE R. ANDERSEN ON 7/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SHERRIE R ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO SHERRIR R ANDERSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Flores, Sarah Elaina