This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 21:24:37 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS BANNERMAN 85, LLC A FLORIDA LI Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2014 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANNERMAN 85, LLC A FLORIDA LI. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Defendants

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE B

LUCCHESE, GINO

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF AMY LAUREN KE

IMAGE PROPERTIES, LLC A GEORGI

KELLY, AMY LAUREN

COLLINS, TRACEY ANNE

UNKNOWN TENANT 2IN POSSESSION

LGM, LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIA

JAMES L SCHMIDT ESQ AS TRUS BK

TATE, DALTON A JR

KELLY, IVEY MONROE

KNIGHT, W DAVID

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF IVEY MONROE K

KNIGHT, JENNIFER C

BANNERMAN 85, LLC A FLORIDA LI

LUCCHESE, CYNTHIA

WERNER, DAVID

MESSER, BILLIE

SNB PROPERTIES I, LLC, A FLORI

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DUNAWAY, WILLIAM JAMES

DOWD, JOHN ROBINSON

SMITH, WHITNEY LEIGH

Other Attorneys

SMITH, COREY J

VANNESS, JOHN ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

08/31/2016:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

07/25/2016:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

COPY OF CHECK FOR DOC STAMPS

07/20/2016:COPY OF CHECK FOR DOC STAMPS

COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF VAN NESS LAW FIRM DATED 07/18/16

07/20/2016:COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF VAN NESS LAW FIRM DATED 07/18/16

CERTIFICATE OF SALE;

07/15/2016:CERTIFICATE OF SALE;

FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG;

07/15/2016:FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG;

COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

07/01/2016:COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF VAN NESS LAW FIRM DATED 06/29/16

07/01/2016:COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF VAN NESS LAW FIRM DATED 06/29/16

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - DEFUNIAK HERALD BREEZE

05/10/2016:PROOF OF PUBLICATION - DEFUNIAK HERALD BREEZE

NOTICE OF SALE-7-15-2016;

04/12/2016:NOTICE OF SALE-7-15-2016;

FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE;

04/12/2016:FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND REFORMATION OF MORTGAGE;

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM;

04/12/2016:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM;

FORECLOSURE FORM FOR FINAL HEARING;

04/12/2016:FORECLOSURE FORM FOR FINAL HEARING;

COPY OF STIPULATION AS TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE;

04/12/2016:COPY OF STIPULATION AS TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE;

PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

04/11/2016:PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF SALE

04/11/2016:PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF SALE

PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

04/11/2016:PROPOSED CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

PROPOSED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

04/11/2016:PROPOSED NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED- JOHN R DOWD JR ESQUIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK FOR DOC STAMPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF VAN NESS LAW FIRM DATED 07/18/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF VAN NESS LAW FIRM DATED 06/29/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - DEFUNIAK HERALD BREEZE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JAMES L. SCHMIDT, ESQ., AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BK LAND TRUST NO. 1 U/T/D 10/01/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMY LAUREN KELLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: IVEY MONROE KELLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO: TRACEY ANNE COLLINS, AS GUARDIAN OF THE PROPERTY OF ZOE SKY KELLY, A MINOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketCERTIFICATE CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMAGE PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, COREY J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VanNess, John Anthony