This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:33:35 (UTC).

DESTIN FIRST BANK VS AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL REL SV Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2009 DESTIN FIRST BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL REL SV. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WELLS, KELVIN C and WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WELLS, KELVIN C

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESTIN FIRST BANK

Defendants

HENDERSON, MICHAEL L

HENDCO CONSTRUCTION INC

HENDERSON, TIMOTHY L

VISION BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL REL SV

JENKINS BRICK COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

PENSACOLA BRICK SALES

HENDERSON, MICHAEL

HENDERSON, MICHAEL LEE

PENSACOLA BRICK SALES, A FLORI

HENDERSON, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE, W WADE

Defendant Attorneys

SCHEYD, JOSEPH MERRILL

FLEMING, EDWARD PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2013
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG: AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK; AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; MDB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; MDB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketFAX FROM WADE WALLACE RE: CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF'S NAME; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO VISION BANK; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JENKINS BRICK COMPANY; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HENDCO CONSTRUCTION INC; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHAEL L HENDERSON; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY L HENDERSON; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS AB; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PLAINTIFF RE STATUS OF RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; LP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL is a litigant

Latest cases where Vision Bank is a litigant