This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 02/11/2021 at 00:33:06 (UTC).

DESTIN FIRST BANK, A FLORIDA B VS AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2009 DESTIN FIRST BANK, A FLORIDA B filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATE. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WELLS, KELVIN C and WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WELLS, KELVIN C

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESTIN FIRST BANK, A FLORIDA B

Defendants

HENDERSON, MICHAEL L

ART'S TV & APPLIANCE, INC. OF

HENDCO CONSTRUCTION, INC., A F

COTTAGES AT EASTERN LAKE OWNER

HENDERSON, TIMOTHY L

HENDERSON, YVETTE M

SANDESTIN OWENRS' ASSOCIATION

VISION BANK, A FLORIDA BANKING

RAVEN OAKS OWNERS' ASSOCIATION

ELITE PAVERS OF NW FLORIDA, IN

H.K.H. INVESTMENT DEVELOPERS,

JENKINS BRICK COMPANY

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATE

Not Classified By Court

HENDERSON, YVETTE MICHELLE

PENSACOLA BRICK SALES

PENSACOLA BRICK SALES, A FLORI

HENDERSON, MICHAEL

HENDERSON, TIMOTHY

HENDERSON, MICHAEL LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE, W WADE

Defendant Attorneys

SCHEYD, JOSEPH MERRILL

DURKIN, DENIS L

FLEMING, EDWARD PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITHMANDATORY EFILE SERVICE RULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • DocketFAX TO MARTY FROM CASSIE ZIHN; AZP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG: MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2010
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE; MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE; MDB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; MDB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • DocketFAX FROM WADE WALLACE RE: CHANGE OF PLAINTIFF'S NAME; JMK

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOC INC VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO RAVEN OAKS OWNERS ASSOC INC VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO H.K.H INVESTMENT DEVELOPERS LLC VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHAEL L HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO YVETTE M HENDERSON VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TIMOTHY L HENDERSON VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HENDCO CONSTRUCTION INC VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED; VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS A T VW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;VW

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANDESTIN OWNERS ASSOCIATION I is a litigant

Latest cases where Vision Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Travel Related Svcs Co Inc is a litigant