This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 12/22/2020 at 04:50:53 (UTC).

DEFRANCESCH, FRED R JR VS BRADLEY, ANDREA Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2016 DEFRANCESCH, FRED R JR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRADLEY, ANDREA. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WELLS, KELVIN C and WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WELLS, KELVIN C

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEFRANCESCH, FRED R JR

Defendants

FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES COR

BRADLEY, CLAY

OSULLIVAN, ALLISON

WALTON COUNTY FLORIDA

OSULLIVAN, MICHAEL

BRADLEY, ANDREA

DEER LAKE DUNES OWNERS ASSOCIA

CHOCTAWHATCHEE ELECTRIC COOPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINSHEW, LISA SUSAN

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFER, STEFAN THOMAS PEAVEY

MELZER, HOLLY KATHLEEN

WARNER, TIMOTHY MICHAEL

BURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE

06/17/2019:ORDER APPROVING MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE

SECOND AMENDED MEDIATION REPORT

06/14/2019:SECOND AMENDED MEDIATION REPORT

STIPULATED MOTION TO APPROVE MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO DISMISS CASE

06/12/2019:STIPULATED MOTION TO APPROVE MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO DISMISS CASE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT, WALTON COUNTY, FL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION DUE TO MOOTNESS 6-5-19 AT 10:00 AM CT

05/22/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT, WALTON COUNTY, FL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION DUE TO MOOTNESS 6-5-19 AT 10:00 AM CT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

05/17/2019:REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

NOTICE OF CONTINUED MEDIATION

04/30/2019:NOTICE OF CONTINUED MEDIATION

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

03/12/2019:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, DEER LAKE DUNES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

02/20/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, DEER LAKE DUNES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

MEDIATOR REPORT

02/18/2019:MEDIATOR REPORT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - FEBRUARY 26, 2019 AT 10:00 AM CST

01/15/2019:NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - FEBRUARY 26, 2019 AT 10:00 AM CST

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

11/15/2018:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFEFNDANT, FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP. OF WALTON COUNTY D/B/A REGIONAL UTILITIES OF WALTON COUNTY

09/28/2018:STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFEFNDANT, FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP. OF WALTON COUNTY D/B/A REGIONAL UTILITIES OF WALTON COUNTY

STIPULATED ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES AND FINAL JUDGMENT

09/05/2018:STIPULATED ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES AND FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS', BRADLEY AND O'SULLIVAN, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I AND II OF THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND THE COURT'S SUA SPONTE ORDER FOR MEDIATION

07/27/2018:ORDER ON DEFENDANTS', BRADLEY AND O'SULLIVAN, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I AND II OF THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND THE COURT'S SUA SPONTE ORDER FOR MEDIATION

STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDAT, CHOCTAWHATCHEE ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC.

07/26/2018:STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDAT, CHOCTAWHATCHEE ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC.

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR JULY 24, 2018 @ 9:00

04/19/2018:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR JULY 24, 2018 @ 9:00

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/17/2018:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER (CLAY BRADLEY, ANDREA BRADLEY, MICHAL O'SULLIVAN, AND ALLISON O'SULLIVAN)

10/13/2017:ANSWER (CLAY BRADLEY, ANDREA BRADLEY, MICHAL O'SULLIVAN, AND ALLISON O'SULLIVAN)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TRIAL 6-19-19 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED MEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED MOTION TO APPROVE MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO DISMISS CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 6-5-19 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT, WALTON COUNTY, FLORIDA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION DUE TO MOOTNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT, WALTON COUNTY, FLORIDA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT, WALTON COUNTY, FLORIDA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT, WALTON COUNTY, FL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION DUE TO MOOTNESS 6-5-19 AT 10:00 AM CT

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR DEER LAKE DUNES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR CHOCTAWHATCHEE ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS MICHAEL O'SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR ALLISON O'SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR CLAY BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR ANDREA BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM LISA S. MINSHEW, P.A., DATED 8/1/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IN EJECTMENT, FOR DAMAGES FOR A CONTINUING TRESPASS, AND TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where WALTON COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINSHEW, LISA S