Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 10/19/2019 at 14:32:42 (UTC).

DAVIS, N HENRY VS GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 DAVIS, N HENRY filed an Other lawsuit against GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Walton County

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, N HENRY

Defendants

WATSON, FRANK

WATSON SEWELL PL

GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION L

HOWARD, SELETA HAYES

SEWELL, KIMBERLY WATSON

WSLT LLC TRUSTEE COASTAL RESOU

HOWARD, PETER J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GORDON, ALFRED BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

10/02/2019:DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

10/02/2019:DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION;

09/25/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION;

COMPLAINT

09/25/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, PETER J HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT WSLT, LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR COASTAL RESOURCES LAND TRUST NO. 5'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF N. HENRY DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES (BEN GORDON, AS ATTORNEY FOR WSLT, LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PETER J HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SELETA HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KIMBERLY WATSON SEWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: FRANK WATSON

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO KIMBERLY WATSON SEWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO FRANK WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO WATSON SEWELL PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO GULF SHORE SOUTH ASSOCIATION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO WSLT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, ALFRED BENJAMIN