Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 03/23/2021 at 18:03:30 (UTC).

DANIELS, CHARLES, DANIELS, TONY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 DANIELS, CHARLES, DANIELS, TONY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GRIMES, DONALD L

WELLS, KAREN

DANIELS, TONY

Decedent

DANIELS, CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

GREEN, WILLIAM HOWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $231.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 140055

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $231.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, WILLIAM HOWARD