This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 11:22:44 (UTC).

CORLEY, JULIE VS COASTAL DREAMIN VACATION RENTA Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 CORLEY, JULIE filed an Other lawsuit against COASTAL DREAMIN VACATION RENTA. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID WALKER and GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORLEY, JULIE

Defendants

COASTAL DREAMIN VACATION RENTA

COPE, CHRIS

MORGAN, WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD, EDWARD KIRKSEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

08/24/2021:COMPLAINT

AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/29/2021:AMENDED COMPLAINT

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

03/10/2022:ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

04/11/2022:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06-21-2022 AT 8:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON 06-21-2022 AT 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: WENDY MORGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CHRIS COPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: COASTAL DREAMIN' VACATION RENTAL & PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $30.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 150609

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR WENDY MORGAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR CHRIS COPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS FOR COASTAL DREAMIN' VACATION RENTAL & PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $300.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 147637

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less