This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:16:35 (UTC).

COOPER, JAMIE RENEE VS COOPER, JAMES III

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 COOPER, JAMIE RENEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COOPER, JAMES III. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COOPER, JAMIE RENEE

Respondent

COOPER, JAMES III

Not Classified By Court

TEAL, JAMIE RENEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketHEARING NOTICE - 11/5/2021 AT 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS- APPROVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE SIGNED BY JAMES COOPER III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; SIGNED BY JAMES COOPER III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED/ JAMES COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPARTIES' INFORMATION SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ONLY JAMIE COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less