This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/24/2019 at 14:31:43 (UTC).

CIT BANK NA Et Al VS CYPRESS CATTLE AND PRODUCE FAR Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 CIT BANK NA filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against CYPRESS CATTLE AND PRODUCE FAR. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • Courthouse:

    Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CIT BANK NA

DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION

Defendants

LANGFORD, MICHAEL

CYPRESS CATTLE AND PRODUCE FAR

Not Classified By Court

& PRODUCE COMPANY, CYPRESS CAT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWIEBEL, ERIC BRET

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES

07/31/2019:VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON SEPTEMBER 5TH, 2019 AT 11:00AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING - SEPTEMBER 5, 2019 AT 11:00AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPERANCE AT REPLEVIN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MICHAEL LANGFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CYPRESS CATTLE & PRODUCE FARM LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MICHAEL LANGFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO CYPRESS CATTLE & PRODUCE FARM LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MICHAEL LANGFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO MICHAEL LANGFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $515.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 119752

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECT CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CIT Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zwiebel, Eric Bret