Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/01/2019 at 16:01:31 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS BARRENTINE, CATHARINA M

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARRENTINE, CATHARINA M. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

BARRENTINE, CATHARINA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CATHARINA BARRENTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $10.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 119512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • UNSIGNED PLURIES SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CATHARINA M BARRENTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • PROOF OF NONSERVICE ON CATHARINA M. BARRENTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CATHARINA M BARRENTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118757

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • UNSIGNED SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO: CATHARINA BARRENTINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Event Date: 09/10/2019 13:30; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Event Date: 08/13/2019 15:00; Judge: GREEN, DAVID W; Docket Type: PT; Location: MX 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUIR , DANIELA