This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 12/08/2022 at 11:15:11 (UTC).

BEASLEY JOHNSON HOLDINGS INC A VS 30 CAMP CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOC Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 BEASLEY JOHNSON HOLDINGS INC A filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against 30 CAMP CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREEN, DAVID W and GREEN, DAVID WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREEN, DAVID W

GREEN, DAVID WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEASLEY JOHNSON HOLDINGS INC A

Defendants

TRI RIVERS DEVELOPMENT LLC A G

30 CAMP CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

MARTIN, VICTOR

MARTIN, CINDA

MCCONNELL, MITCHELL

MCCONNELL, BARBARA

SWEDENBURG, SHAUN

SWEDENBURG, RICHANE

ZACHARKO, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POWELL, ROBERT JAMES

Defendant Attorney

EASTBURN, SASHA L.

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF TRI RIVERS DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

12/05/2022:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF TRI RIVERS DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

RESPONSE SWEDENBURG DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2022:RESPONSE SWEDENBURG DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE MCCONNELL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2022:RESPONSE MCCONNELL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE DEFENDANT ZACHARKO'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2022:RESPONSE DEFENDANT ZACHARKO'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE MARTIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/02/2022:RESPONSE MARTIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF FILING MCCONNELL DEFENDANTS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING MCCONNELL DEFENDANTS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING SWEDENBURG DEFENDANTS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES T PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING SWEDENBURG DEFENDANTS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES T PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING MARTIN DEFENDANTS' UNIVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTEROGATORIES

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING MARTIN DEFENDANTS' UNIVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTEROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT ZACHARKOS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT ZACHARKOS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - BARBARA MCCONNELL

06/24/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - BARBARA MCCONNELL

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - MITCHELL MCCONNELL

06/24/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - MITCHELL MCCONNELL

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - CINDA MARTIN

06/24/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - CINDA MARTIN

UNSIGNED SUMMONS - VICTOR MARTIN

06/24/2022:UNSIGNED SUMMONS - VICTOR MARTIN

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

06/24/2022:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTES

06/24/2022:CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTES

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

06/24/2022:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/24/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

06/24/2022:VERIFIED COMPLAINT

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF TRI RIVERS DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSWEDENBURG DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMCCONNELL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ZACHARKO'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMARTIN DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MCCONNELL DEFENDANTS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SWEDENBURG DEFENDANTS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES T PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MARTIN DEFENDANTS' UNIVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTEROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT ZACHARKOS' UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM OF BEASLEY JOHNSON HOLDINGS, INC,'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - SHAUN SWEDENBURG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - BARBARA MCCONNELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - MITCHELL MCCONNELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - CINDA MARTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS - VICTOR MARTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTBURN, SASHA L.