This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 06/14/2022 at 04:18:55 (UTC).

BANKS BROWN, FRANCINA VS BROWN, ALFRED

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 BANKS BROWN, FRANCINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROWN, ALFRED. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELLS, KELVIN CLYDE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BANKS BROWN, FRANCINA

Respondent

BROWN, ALFRED

Not Classified By Court

BANKS, FRANCINA LOUISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ADKINSON, CLAYTON J M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $27.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 153773

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $27.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $408.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 146797

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketPHOTO IDENTIFICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADKINSON, CLAYTON J M