This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 18:54:33 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA TH VS COLLINS, STEPHEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA TH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COLLINS, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREEN, DAVID W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREEN, DAVID W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA TH

Defendants

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI

THOMAS PAGANI, UNKNOWN SPOUSE

STEPHEN J COLLINS, UNKNOWN SPO

PAGANI, THOMAS

ROSEMARY BEACH PROPERTY OWNERS

TENANT 1, UNKNOWN

COLLINS, STEPHEN

TENANT 2, UNKNOWN

THE FLATS AT ROSEMARY BEACH CO

Not Classified By Court

COLLINS, STEPHEN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON, ANDY WAYNE

Defendant Attorneys

SCHEYD, JOSEPH MERRILL

PERRY, AMY AUGUSTE

 

Court Documents

COVER LETTER TO KELLEY, KRONENBERG, P.A. DATED 09/21/16

09/21/2016:COVER LETTER TO KELLEY, KRONENBERG, P.A. DATED 09/21/16

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS CASE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS

08/11/2016:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS CASE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS CASE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS

08/03/2016:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS CASE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

08/03/2016:NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/03/2016:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SALE 9/15/16

07/18/2016:NOTICE OF SALE 9/15/16

PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE

07/18/2016:PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE

COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

07/15/2016:COPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF KELLEY KRONENBERG DATED 07/08/16

07/15/2016:COVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF KELLEY KRONENBERG DATED 07/08/16

AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

07/15/2016:AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/11/2016:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF FILING

07/11/2016:NOTICE OF FILING

PROPOSED AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

07/08/2016:PROPOSED AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

07/05/2016:JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - DEFUNIAK HERALD

04/12/2016:PROOF OF PUBLICATION - DEFUNIAK HERALD

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/21/2016:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF SALE 7/20/16

03/17/2016:NOTICE OF SALE 7/20/16

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

03/16/2016:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO KELLEY, KRONENBERG, P.A. DATED 09/21/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS CASE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, DISMISS CASE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE 9/15/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF JUDICIAL SALE AND/OR ESALE CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER FROM THE OFFICE OF KELLEY KRONENBERG DATED 07/08/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 20, 2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF THOMAS PAGANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHEN COLLINS AKA STEPHEN J COLLINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO THOMAS PAGANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO STEPHEN COLLINS AKA STEPHEN J COLLINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE & RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 08/03/2016; Reopen Close Date: 08/11/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketReopen Date: 07/05/2016; Reopen Close Date: 07/15/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSEMARY BEACH PROPERTY OWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMSON, ANDY WAYNE