Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Walton County Courts on 08/02/2019 at 18:01:04 (UTC).

BAIN, EDITH GRACE, BAIN, GARY LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 BAIN, EDITH GRACE, BAIN, GARY LEE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Walton County Courts, South Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Walton County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Walton County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAIN, GARY LEE

Not Classified By Court

BAIN, GREGORY K

BAIN, STEVEN M

BAIN, SOL R

BAIN, GARY L.

BAIN, EDITH G.

Decedent

BAIN, EDITH GRACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • EXEMPLIFIED/AUTHENTICATED COPIES FROM EL PASO COUNTY COLORADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • COVER LETTER FROM THE CRTIZER LAW FIRM DATED 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE (TESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $345.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 118818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINSTRATION & ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • RECEIPT OF FUNERAL EXPENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - ESTATE OVER $1000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less