This case was last updated from Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/23/2019 at 19:11:43 (UTC).

ARMSTRONG, JAMES W Et Al VS CANTWELL AND GOLDMAN, P.A. Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2014 ARMSTRONG, JAMES W filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CANTWELL AND GOLDMAN, P A. This case was filed in Walton County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and SANTURRI, THOMAS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

SANTURRI, THOMAS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SEVEN D WHOLESALE OF FLORIDA

ARMSTRONG, JAMES W

Defendants

CANTWELL AND GOLDMAN, P.A.

ROCKLEDGE SUPPLY LLC

JOSEPH, MILA

COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REMINGTON, SCOTT ALEXANDER

HOFFMAN, ROBERT J

Defendant Attorneys

BARRETT, JODI GOLDBERG

CREW, MICHAEL H

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S, COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-US LMB, LLC, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

11/18/2018:DEFENDANT'S, COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-US LMB, LLC, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

10/24/2018:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-US LBM, LLC

10/18/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-US LBM, LLC

PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT TO IMPLEAD SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENDANTS

10/18/2018:PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT TO IMPLEAD SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENDANTS

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMMENCE PROCEEDINGS SUPPLEMENTARY AND TO IMPLEAD SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENDANTS

10/18/2018:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMMENCE PROCEEDINGS SUPPLEMENTARY AND TO IMPLEAD SUPPLEMENTAL DEFENDANTS

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

07/07/2015:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN AID OF EXECUTION TO DEFENDANT, JOSEPH A. MILA

06/09/2015:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IN AID OF EXECUTION TO DEFENDANT, JOSEPH A. MILA

NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES IN AID OF EXECUTION TO DEFENDANTS, ROCKLEDGE SUPPLY, LLC F/K/A COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY, LLC AND JOSEPH A. MILA

06/09/2015:NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES IN AID OF EXECUTION TO DEFENDANTS, ROCKLEDGE SUPPLY, LLC F/K/A COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY, LLC AND JOSEPH A. MILA

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

06/09/2015:NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND STRIKING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

05/01/2015:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND STRIKING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

05/01/2015:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT;

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL.

04/14/2015:MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL.

EXHIBIT 5 - ARTICLES OF AMENDMENT

10/22/2014:EXHIBIT 5 - ARTICLES OF AMENDMENT

EXHIBIT 4 - INVOICE

10/22/2014:EXHIBIT 4 - INVOICE

EXHIBIT 3 - STOP PAYMENT CHECKS

10/22/2014:EXHIBIT 3 - STOP PAYMENT CHECKS

EXHIBIT 2 - PERSONAL GUARANTY

10/22/2014:EXHIBIT 2 - PERSONAL GUARANTY

EXHIBIT CREDIT APPLICATION

10/22/2014:EXHIBIT CREDIT APPLICATION

LETTER TO JUDGE WELLS FROM CPH DATED 07/17/14

07/18/2014:LETTER TO JUDGE WELLS FROM CPH DATED 07/17/14

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, CANTWELL AND GOLDMAN, P.A.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-USLBM, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2018
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S, COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-US LMB, LLC, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST COASTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, CANTWELL AND GOLDMAN, P.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO JUDICIAL ADMINSTRATION RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY-US LBM, LLC ON 10/18/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: JOSEPH A MILA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO COASTAL ROOFING SUPPLY, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH A MILA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketReopen Date: 10/18/2018; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REMINGTON, SCOTT A