This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 08/11/2020 at 15:18:19 (UTC).

ALLEN, DONNA VS ALLEN, CODY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 ALLEN, DONNA filed an Other lawsuit against ALLEN, CODY. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY E and LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN, DONNA

Defendant

ALLEN, CODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, BERT EDWARD

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EJECTMENT

01/30/2020:MOTION FOR EJECTMENT

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

06/08/2020:ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 8-25-20 AT 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 8-25-20 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 10-8-20 AT 3:03 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY CODY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY CODY ALLEN ON COPY OF MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 6-8-2020 AT 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 4-9-2020 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO CODY ALLEN ON 2/5/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO CODY LOUIS ALLEN ON 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO: CODY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED SUMMONS TO CODY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EJECTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 126657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE, BERT EDWARD