This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Walton County on 11/19/2021 at 14:34:21 (UTC).

ADAMS, REBECCA VS KING, H ROSS

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 ADAMS, REBECCA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KING, H ROSS. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Walton County, Walton County Courthouse located in Walton, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD and LEWIS, JEFFREY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Walton, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD

LEWIS, JEFFREY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADAMS, REBECCA

ADAMS, MATTHEW

Defendant

KING, H ROSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRATT, DENNIS LEE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/20/2021:COMPLAINT

UNSIGNED NOTICE OF ACTION

10/20/2021:UNSIGNED NOTICE OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEMAIL CONFIRMATION FROM THE DEFUNIAK HERALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 150154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNSIGNED NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRATT, DENNIS LEE