Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:08:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. WILLIAM CLYDE DORAN

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAM CLYDE DORAN. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Daytona Beach Justice Center located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAYTON, RAUL A ZAMBRANO and ZAMBRANO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLAYTON

RAUL A ZAMBRANO

ZAMBRANO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

WILLIAM CLYDE DORAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

JOSEPH LEDONNE

Defendant Attorney

ANGELA LOWREY

 

Court Documents

MEMO TO FILE

05/24/2021 : MEMO TO FILE

REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

05/24/2021 : REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

NO INFORMATION FILED

05/21/2021 : NO INFORMATION FILED

CITATION

05/13/2021 : CITATION

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

05/10/2021 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

05/09/2021 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

05/08/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment-Custody; Court Officer: ZAMBRANO; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Type: MEMO TO FILE; Description: FIX CUSTODY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED; Description: EMAILED VCBJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: COPY ADF613E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: CITATION; Description: ADF613E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH LEDONNE