Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Volusia County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 14:06:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. TYLER ALYSSA CAMPBELL

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TYLER ALYSSA CAMPBELL. This case was filed in Volusia County Courts, Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CROMARTIE and DAVID A CROMARTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************MMDB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Volusia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Daytona Beach Courthouse Annex

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CROMARTIE

DAVID A CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TYLER ALYSSA CAMPBELL

Not Classified By Court

BOB BARRY BAIL BONDS

Daytona Beach, FL 32124

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANESSA BROOKS

 

Court Documents

RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

03/30/2021 : RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

03/17/2021 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

03/03/2021 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

03/02/2021 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD-Unrep (Def. A-L); Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Judge Cromartie Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Judge Cromartie Remote Zoom Hearing; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: RECEIVED CORRESPONDENCE; Description: Bob Barry Bail - Updated address for Def

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANESSA BROOKS