This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 09/25/2022 at 13:48:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. TREY MICHAEL STERNER WOLFE

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TREY MICHAEL STERNER WOLFE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CROMARTIE, DAWN NICHOLS and NICHOLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAWN NICHOLS

NICHOLS

CROMARTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TREY MICHAEL STERNER WOLFE

Orange City, FL 32763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOVISA J ALEXANDER

713 W New York Ave

Deland, FL 32720

NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

Defendant Attorney

CASSIE REX

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

08/09/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

08/09/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

08/10/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MOTION

08/19/2022 : MOTION

ORDER FOR TASC EVALUATION

08/19/2022 : ORDER FOR TASC EVALUATION

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

08/23/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

09/08/2022 : MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/12/2022 : NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Pre-trial-PD (Atty. L-Z); Trial Date/Time: 11/14/2022 08:30 AM; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: TASC JUDICIAL EVALUATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Criminal Hearing; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING; Description: 09/15/2022 @ 2PM - BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: NG Plea-Set For Pre-Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: ORDER FOR TASC EVALUATION; Description: EMAILED TO TASC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: MOTION; Description: FOR TASC EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: CROMARTIE; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVISA J ALEXANDER