This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 06/26/2022 at 19:58:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. THEODORE J LEVESQUE

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THEODORE J LEVESQUE. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NICHOLS, SANDERS and DAWN NICHOLS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NICHOLS

SANDERS

DAWN NICHOLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

Defendant

THEODORE J LEVESQUE

Deltona, FL 32725

Not Classified By Court

AAA HELP BAIL BONDS UNLIMITED, INC.

205 N. Industrial Dr, Suite 5

Orange City, FL 32763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

STATE ATTORNEY

251 N Ridgewood Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

LOVISA J ALEXANDER

713 W New York Ave

Deland, FL 32720

Defendant Attorney

CASSIE REX

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/02/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

06/06/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

06/03/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

06/09/2022 : SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

06/14/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

06/21/2022 : WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/22/2022 : NOTICE OF HEARING

WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

06/23/2022 : WRITTEN PLEA FORM FILED

SCORE SHEET

06/23/2022 : SCORE SHEET

RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

06/24/2022 : RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Docket Type: RCV'D CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEF; Description: EMAILED TO DIV 08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Criminal Hearing; Court Officer: NICHOLS; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4B; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 416.00; Final Amount: 416.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 416.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 2.00; Final Amount: 2.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 50.00; Final Amount: 50.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • FinancialQuantity: 1; Unit Amount: 100.00; Final Amount: 100.00; Credits: 0.00; Balance: 100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Docket(#13) Docket Type: COURT ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docket Type: NOTICE OF HEARING; Description: 06/23/2022 @ 8:30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Type: WAIVED PRESENCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#6) Docket Type: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docket Type: SURETY APPEARANCE BOND-ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docket(#4) Docket Type: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE/INDIGENT/ORDER APPT.PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: SANDERS; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA HELP BAIL BONDS UNLIMITED, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS KRAMPERTH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVISA J ALEXANDER