This case was last updated from Volusia County Circuit Courts on 07/29/2022 at 16:42:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA V. TAMARA A SMITH

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TAMARA A SMITH. This case was filed in Volusia County Circuit Courts, Volusia County Courthouse Deland located in Volusia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES R CLAYTON, CLAYTON and DEMPSEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CFDL

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Volusia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES R CLAYTON

CLAYTON

DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TAMARA A SMITH

Deland, FL 32724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMY L WALKER

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM P ARNAU

100 East Granada Blvd, Suite 215 F

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

CAMERON Z BROWN

251 North Ridgewood Avenue

Daytona Beach, FL 32114

 

Court Documents

CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

06/28/2022 : CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

06/28/2022 : FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

06/29/2022 : NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

07/11/2022 : NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

07/18/2022 : NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

07/18/2022 : STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER

07/18/2022 : ORDER

NO INFORMATION FILED

07/20/2022 : NO INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSession Type: Arraignment (Def. L-Z); Court Officer: CLAYTON; Location: DeLand Courtroom 4C; Status: Case Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#14); Docket Type: REDUCED TO COUNTY COURT-COPY 707 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13); Docket Type: NO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12); Docket Type: ORDER; Description: ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11); Docket Type: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10); Docket Type: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & PLEA OF NOT GUILTY:; Description: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY - WILLIAM ARNAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8); Docket Type: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docket(#7); Docket Type: DRIVING RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketSession Type: First Appearance; Court Officer: DEMPSEY; Location: Branch Jail Courtroom 1; Status: FA Forms Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#6); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AFPJDPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#5); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AFPJDQE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docket(#4); Docket Type: CITATION; Description: AFPJDOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2); Docket Type: FIRST APPEARANCE ACTION FORM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1); Docket Type: CHARGING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY L WALKER